FL H0225 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certified copies of official public documents to be filed electronically.
Title
Self Authentication of Documents
Sponsors
House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Heather Fitzenhagen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | CS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-20 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-19 | House | CS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/19/16, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-17 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-11-09 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-11-03 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-10-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 11/03/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-10-07 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-09-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0352 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
90 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
90 | 902 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |