FL H0223 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-191
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes posting of specified types of insurance policies & endorsements on insurer's Internet website in lieu of mailing or delivery to insured if insurer complies with certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#33 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-17 Chapter No. 2013-191
2013-06-14 Approved by Governor
2013-06-10 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2013-04-26HouseOrdered enrolled
2013-04-25SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2013-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2013-04-24SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2013-04-24SenateRead 2nd time
2013-04-24SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 418
2013-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2013-04-24SenateWithdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism
2013-04-03SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism
2013-04-03SenateReceived
2013-04-02SenateIn Messages
2013-03-22HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2013-03-22HouseRead 3rd time
2013-03-21HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2013-03-21HouseRead 2nd time
2013-03-19HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/21/13
2013-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2013-03-14HouseFavorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2013-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 03/14/13, 1:30 pm, 404 HOB
2013-03-05HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
2013-03-05HouseIntroduced
2013-03-04HouseNow in Regulatory Affairs Committee
2013-02-27HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2013-02-19HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2013-02-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 02/19/13, 3:00 pm, 404 HOB
2013-01-30HouseReferred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
2013-01-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0418 (Similar To) 2013-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 223 (Ch. 2013-191)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
627421Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/223
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0223/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0223/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0223/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0223/Amendment/259339/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0223/Amendment/664197/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0223/Amendment/023117/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0223/Amendment/227839/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0223/FloorVotes/UEWGnW9MfuA8s2zc8Z%3DPL%3DHta81Y%3DPL%3Ds%3D%7C14%2FPublic%2FVotes%2FBill%2F20130322%2FHouseVote%5Fh0223c1024%2EPDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0223/FloorVotes/JqaoAo4WQo3Dzv0bJuOWo5jNrpI%3D%7C14%2FPublic%2FVotes%2FBill%2F20130425%2FSenateVote%5Fh0223c1033%2EPDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback