FL S0418 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 223 (Ch. 2013-191)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 223 (Ch. 2013-191)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the posting of specified types of insurance policies and endorsements on an insurer's Internet website in lieu of mailing or delivery to the insured if the insurer complies with certain conditions, etc.
Title
Delivery of Insurance Policies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 223 (Ch. 2013-191) |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 223 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/13 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-15 | Senate | CS by- Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 1 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/15/13, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/09/13, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0223 (Similar To) 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-191