FL H0219 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1380
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1380
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises rights that are not affected or extinguished by marketable record titles; revises what types of interests are extinguished by marketable record title; authorizes owner or operator of private property utilized for motor vehicle parking to establish rules, rates, & fines, including parking charges, which govern private persons who park their motor vehicles on such private property; prohibits county or municipality from enacting certain ordinances or regulations; provides that certain ordinances or regulations are null & void; requires persons with certain interests in land which may be extinguished by this act to file specified notice to preserve such interests.
Title
Real Property Rights
Sponsors
House Civil Justice and Property Rights Subcommittee | Rep. Kaylee Tuck [R] | Rep. Christopher Benjamin [D] | Rep. Thomas Fabricio [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1380 |
2022-03-03 | House | Substituted CS/SB 1380 |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2022-02-07 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-18 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-18 | House | Original reference removed: Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-01-14 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-14 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-14 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-14 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Favorable with CS by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | PCS added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda |
2021-11-23 | House | Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda |
2021-10-22 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-09-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1380 (Similar To) 2022-06-08 - Chapter No. 2022-171
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
712 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
712 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
712 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
715 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |