FL H0207 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides conditions under which certain entities may acquire title to certain water or wastewater plant utility facilities; establishes method by which PSC may establish rate base value for acquired utility systems; specifies PSC duties regarding petitions & providing standard of review; requires approved rate base value to be reflected in acquiring utility's next rate case; establishes procedure for appraisal of acquired utility system; specifies contents required for petition to PSC for approval of rate base value of acquired utility system; specifies commission's retained authority.
Title
Acquisition of Water and Wastewater Systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-02 | House | CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-27 | House | CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 1 |
2020-02-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-01-28 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-15 | House | Now in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-15 | House | Favorable by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 9:30 am, Webster Hall |
2019-10-10 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-09-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S658 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
367 | 0712 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |