FL H0207 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates act as "Pets' Trust Act"; authorizes counties to create independent special districts &, if approved by referendum, levy ad valorem taxes to provide funding for pet services & advocacy programs; creates Pets' Trust council; provides for council membership, powers, & functions; provides that certain nonbinding straw ballots satisfy referendum requirements; provides for future expiration.
Title
Pet Services and Advocacy Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0670 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/207 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0207/BillText/Filed/PDF |