FL H0205 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reduces period for which criminal history records of certain minors must be retained before expungement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal History Records of Minors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-01-15HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2015-01-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0334 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Judiciary
S1316 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9430515Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback