FL H0201 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases income eligibility threshold for coverage under Florida Kidcare program; authorizes AHCA to seek federal waiver approval or submit state plan amendments as necessary; requires agency to examine graduated family contribution rates for newly qualifying families under program; provides guidelines for such rates; requires agency to increase income eligibility threshold for coverage under program each fiscal year until meeting specified income threshold.
Title
Florida Kidcare Program Eligibility
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Bartleman [D] | Rep. Christopher Benjamin [D] | Rep. Nicholas Duran [D] | Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] |
Rep. Michael Grieco [D] | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] | Rep. Allison Tant [D] | Rep. Marie Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Finance and Facilities Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1244 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 8132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 814 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/201 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/201/BillText/Filed/PDF |