FL H0197 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-137
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-137
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits installation of tracking device or tracking application without person's consent; creates presumption that consent is revoked upon initiation of specified proceedings; provides exceptions; provides that violations of prohibition on installation of tracking devices & tracking applications by private investigative, private security, & repossession services are grounds for disciplinary action, to which penalties apply.
Title
Tracking Devices or Tracking Applications
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Larry Metz [R] | Sen. Ben Albritton [R] |
Sen. Frank Artiles [R] | Rep. Dwight Dudley [D] | Rep. Clovis Watson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#156 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#156 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Chapter No. 2015-137 | |
2015-06-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-06-11 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-24 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-24 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 282 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Rules |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Rules |
2015-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-16 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/15 |
2015-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-03 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2015-04-03 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-04-02 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/02/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-04 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable by Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 03/03/15, 4:30 pm, 12 HOB |
2015-02-05 | House | Now in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee |
2015-02-04 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-02-03 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-01-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/03/15, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0282 (Same As) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 197 (Ch. 2015-137)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
493 | 6118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |