FL H0193 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to compensation of members & chairman of board of county commissioners, travel expenses for members of commission, & funds for entertainment of dignitaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charlotte County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#28 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#33 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Approved by Governor
2019-05-09 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-01HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-01SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 05/01/19
2019-04-02SenateReceived
2019-03-28SenateReferred to Rules
2019-03-27SenateIn Messages
2019-03-27HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-03-27HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-03-27HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/19
2019-03-05HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-19HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2019-02-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/19/19, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-02-08HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-02-07HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-02-06HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 02/06/19, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-09HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback