FL H0189 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides reporting requirements for postsecondary institutions; revises provisions relating to dual enrollment programs; renames collegiate high school programs as early college acceleration programs; revises requirements for such programs.
Title
Postsecondary Education for Secondary Students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#271 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Education |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations |
2019-04-29 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-29 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-26 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (526009, 820269) |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | CS/CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-12 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-09 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2019-04-03 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | CS/CS by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-04-02 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-01 | House | CS/CS by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/01/19, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-22 | House | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-22 | House | CS referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | CS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-21 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-19 | House | CS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-15 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 12:00 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1342 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1007 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 271 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 273 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |