FL S1342 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring postsecondary institutions to annually report specified information to the Commissioner of Education; revising the grade point average requirement for student eligibility relating to initial and continued enrollment in college credit dual enrollment courses; requiring, rather than authorizing, instructional materials to be made available to certain dual enrollment students free of charge; providing additional options for students participating in an early college program; authorizing certain private school and home education students to enroll in an early college program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Postsecondary Education for Secondary Students

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-09SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/09/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-03SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2019-04-03SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-04-03SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-02SenateCS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 04/02/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 03/26/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-02-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H189 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100727Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1007271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1007273Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback