FL H0189 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that crime victim entitled to restitution may include trade association representing owner or lawful producer of recording who sustains loss as result of physical piracy; provides limitation of restitution obligation to specifically exclude acts of online piracy; defines "trade association."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Restitution

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#763 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-07 Ordered enrolled -HJ 1178
2012-03-07 CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 912
2012-03-07 Withdrawn from Commerce and Tourism; Criminal Justice; Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Budget -SJ 912
2012-03-05 Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Criminal Justice; Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Budget -SJ 812
2012-03-05 Received -SJ 812
2012-02-22 In Messages
2012-02-16 CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 -HJ 636
2012-02-16 Read 3rd time -HJ 636
2012-02-15 Placed on 3rd reading
2012-02-15 Read 2nd time -HJ 619
2012-02-13 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/15/12
2012-02-06 Placed on Calendar -HJ 525
2012-02-02 CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time -HJ 445
2012-02-02 Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2012-02-01 CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 455
2012-01-30 On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/01/12, 8:30 am, 404 HOB
2012-01-10 CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 163
2012-01-10 Introduced -HJ 21
2011-11-18 Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 169
2011-11-17 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-11-16 CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 174
2011-11-09 On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/16/11, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2011-10-18 Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 171
2011-10-18 Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 171
2011-10-11 On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 10/18/11, 9:00 am, 404 HOB
2011-10-03 Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 21
2011-09-21 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
54011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775089Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback