FL H0185 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Chapter No. 2015-86
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Chapter No. 2015-86
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for certain identification & location information of current or former servicemembers of United States Armed Forces, Reserve Forces, or National Guard, & spouses & children; provides applicability; provides for future review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Public Records/Active Duty Servicemembers and Families
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#146 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#146 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Chapter No. 2015-86 | |
2015-06-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-23 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-23 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 674 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2015-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-16 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/15 |
2015-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-02 | House | CS/CS/CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2015-04-02 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-04-01 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 04/01/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-27 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-03-26 | House | CS/CS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-26 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-24 | House | CS/CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | CS by Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-18 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2015-02-13 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-02-11 | House | CS by Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 02/11/15, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred to Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0674 (Same As) 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 185 (Ch. 2015-86)