FL H0173 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6-2)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6-2)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-142
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provision related to development and implementation of IEPs for students with disabilities regarding postsecondary education and career opportunities including such IEP requirements, timeline, information provided, & statement of intent; requires DOE Education to review specified services & programs; requires DOE to establish & publish uniform best practices for such services & programs.
Title
Individual Education Plan Requirements for Students with Disabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#244 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#244 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Chapter No. 2021-142 | |
2021-06-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-22 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-22 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-22 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 726 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-21 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021) |
2021-03-29 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-03-25 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-25 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2021-03-16 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Original reference removed: PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-12 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-12 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-12 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-12 | House | Reported out of Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-12 | House | Favorable with CS by Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | PCS added to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-20 | House | Referred to Secondary Education and Career Development Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education and Employment Committee |
2021-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S726 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 173 (Ch. 2021-142)