FL H0173 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See HB 7109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See HB 7109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes counties imposing tourist development tax to use those tax revenues for auditoriums that are publicly owned but operated by specified organizations under certain circumstances.
Title
Tourist Development Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | See HB 7109 |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee |
2017-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0068 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7109 (Ch. 2017-36)
H7109 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Chapter No. 2017-36, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7099 (Ch. 2017-67)
H7109 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Chapter No. 2017-36, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7099 (Ch. 2017-67)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/173 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0173/BillText/Filed/PDF |