FL H0173 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for lease of sovereignty submerged lands for private residential single-family docks & piers, private residential multifamily docks & piers, & private residential multislip docks; provides for term of lease & lease fees; provides for inspection of such docks, piers, & related structures by DEP; clarifies authority of Board of Trustees of the Internal Improvement Trust Fund & DEP to impose additional fees & requirements; provides appropriation. APPROPRIATION:
Title
Sovereignty Submerged Lands
Sponsors
House Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee | House Finance and Tax Committee | Rep. James Frishe [R] | Rep. William Snyder [R] |
Rep. Trudi Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#463 (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-05-02 | In Messages | |
2011-05-02 | Read 3rd time -HJ 998 | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time -HJ 958 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/11 | |
2011-04-14 | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 644 | |
2011-04-12 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/14/11, 9:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-04-11 | Now in State Affairs Committee -HJ 610 | |
2011-04-08 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-05 | CS/CS by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0 -HJ 601 | |
2011-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 04/05/11, 11:45 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-03-31 | Now in Finance and Tax Committee -HJ 389 | |
2011-03-30 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-28 | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 390 | |
2011-03-24 | PCS on Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 03/28/11, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 21 | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 21 | |
2011-01-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0332 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration