FL H0157 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-141
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-141
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises grade levels that school districts are encouraged provide certain first aid training; requires school district provide specified grade levels with certain first aid training; provides requirements for such training.
Title
First Aid Training in Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#40 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#294 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#294 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Chapter No. 2021-141 | |
2021-06-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-26 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-26 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-26 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted for SB 280 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-26 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-23 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/23/2021) |
2021-04-19 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Favorable by Education & Employment Committee |
2021-04-18 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2021-04-09 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-07 | House | Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-04-02 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-31 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-31 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported out of Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable with CS by Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-26 | House | Added to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-20 | House | Referred to Secondary Education and Career Development Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education and Employment Committee |
2021-01-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S280 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2021-141)