FL H0145 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
Pending: House Tourism, Infrastructure and Energy Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Jan 18 @ 2:00 pm House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises weight limit of vehicle defined as "ROV."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recreational Off-Highway Vehicle Weight Limits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-09-29HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-09-29HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-09-29HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-09-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S474 (Same As) 2022-01-12 - Now in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
26103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3170003Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback