FL H0139 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 29 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Added to Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires tax collectors or third parties contracted with tax collectors to enter into memorandum of understanding with DHSMV & make certain determinations; requires DHSMV to ensure certain technology used by tax collectors protects customer privacy & data; authorizes DHSMV to provide certain technology to tax collectors upon request in order to provide data access & uniform interface functionalities for registration renewal transactions; authorizes use of data & functionality for certain purposes; requires development of data access & uniform interface functionalities by certain date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle and Vessel Registration Data

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-14HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-04-14HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-04-14HouseFavorable by Commerce Committee
2021-04-12HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-04-06HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-04-06HouseReported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-06HouseFavorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-02HouseAdded to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-26HouseNow in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-26HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-26HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-03-24House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-24HouseCS Filed
2021-03-24HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-23HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-22HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-18HousePCS added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-05HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-01-20HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure and Energy Subcommittee; Infrastructure and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2020-12-29HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S754 (Same As) 2021-04-14 - On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32873Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback