FL H0103 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "violent felony"; provides that person is disqualified from receiving compensation under Victims of Wrongful Incarceration Compensation Act if, before or during person's wrongful conviction & incarceration, person was convicted of, pled guilty or nolo contendere to, or was serving concurrent incarceration for, another violent felony; provides that wrongfully incarcerated person who commits violent felony law violation, rather than felony law violation, which results in revocation of parole or community supervision is ineligible for compensation; reenacts provisions.
Title
Compensation of Victims of Wrongful Incarceration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-01-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2014-12-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0162 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
961 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/103 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0103/BillText/Filed/PDF |