FL H0101 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revises amounts of retainage that local governmental entities & contractors may withhold from progress payments for construction services contract; revises requirements for DMS rules governing certain contracts; revises amounts of retainage that public entities & contractors may withhold from progress payments for construction services contract.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Construction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#99 (Y: 104 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Appropriations
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 104 NAYS 10
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseAmendment(s) adopted (404883) 623
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-25HouseCS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2019-03-22HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-21HouseCS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 1
2019-03-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 03/21/19, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-13HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2019-03-13HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1
2019-03-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-05HouseCS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-18HouseNow in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
2019-02-15HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-02-14HouseCS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1
2019-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall
2019-01-03HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2018-12-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S246 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21872Amended CodeSee Bill Text
218735Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25505Amended CodeSee Bill Text
255072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
255077Amended CodeSee Bill Text
255078Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback