FL H0083 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2014-184)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2014-184)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates "Arts for All Students Act"; requires DOE to publish "Arts for All Students" annual report; provides components of fine arts curriculum; requires criteria & formula for granting "Arts for All Students" model school & model school district designations; provides for annual award of designations.
Title
Arts for All Students Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Saunders [D] | Sen. Lori Berman [D] | Sen. Shevrin Jones [D] | Sen. Kevin Rader [D] |
Rep. Holly Raschein [R] | Rep. Hazelle Rogers [D] | Sen. Linda Stewart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in K-12 Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2014-184) |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2013-10-07 | House | Referred to K-12 Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2013-09-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0087 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2014-184)
S0420 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2014-184)
S0850 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-184, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39)
S0420 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2014-184)
S0850 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-184, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/83 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0083/BillText/Filed/PDF |