FL H0079 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires certain individual health insurance policies & health maintenance contracts to provide coverage for hearing aids for children 21 years of age or younger; specifies health care providers who may prescribe, fit, & dispense hearing aids; specifies minimum coverage limit within certain timeframe; provides exception; provides that insureds & subscribers are responsible for certain costs that exceed policy limit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Coverage for Hearing Aids for Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-09-22HouseNow in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2021-09-22HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-09-22HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-09-22HouseReferred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2021-09-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S498 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/27/22, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6276413Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback