FL H0079 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 22 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies conditions under which members of board or commission of state agency or authority or of agency or authority of county, municipal corporation, or political subdivision may participate in fact-finding exercises or excursions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Meetings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied on Calendar
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-27HouseCS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time
2018-02-26HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-26HouseCS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2018-02-25HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/26/18, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-29HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-29HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 2
2018-01-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/29/18, 3:00 pm, 12 HOB
2018-01-23HouseNow in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2018-01-23HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2018-01-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-08-30HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-08-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S192 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
286011Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback