FL H0077 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits sports franchise from constructing, reconstructing, renovating, or improving facility on leased public land; requires sale of public land for sports franchise facility be at fair market value; provides requirements for contract to fund construction, reconstruction, renovation, or improvement of facility; specifies act does not impair contracts entered into before July 1, 2017.
Title
Sports Franchise Facilities
Sponsors
House Government Accountability Committee | Sen. Bryan Avila [R] | Rep. Dane Eagle [R] | Rep. Charlie Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#48 (Y: 82 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2017-04-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-03-30 | House | CS passed; YEAS 82 NAYS 33 |
2017-03-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Amendment(s) failed (432903) |
2017-03-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/29/17 |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 8 |
2017-03-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/15/17, 2:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-05 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-02-21 | House | CS by Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 5 |
2017-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/21/17, 10:00 am, Morris Hall |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Government Accountability Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2016-12-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0122 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism