FL H0075 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Chapter No. 2016-15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Chapter No. 2016-15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits person from removing, destroying, altering, tampering with, damaging, or circumventing operation of electronic monitoring device being worn or used pursuant to court order or order by Florida Commission on Offender Review; prohibits request, authorization, or solicitation of person to perform such act; specifies that DOC may electronically monitor offender sentenced to community control when court has imposed electronic monitoring as condition of community control.
Title
Electronic Monitoring Devices
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Sen. Victor Torres [D] | Rep. Scott Plakon [R] |
Rep. Richard Stark [D] | Rep. Clovis Watson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#599 (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#599 (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | Chapter No. 2016-15 | |
2016-03-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-01 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-02-24 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2016-02-24 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 954 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Received |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2016-02-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-02-24 | House | Immediately certified |
2016-02-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 3 |
2016-02-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/16 |
2016-02-08 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-05 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-04 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/04/16, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-19 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2015-11-18 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/18/15, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-11-09 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-11-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-11-04 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-10-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 11/04/15, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-09-10 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-08-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0954 (Similar To) 2016-02-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 75 (Ch. 2016-15)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
843 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |