FL H0075 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits stopping bus in manner that impedes traffic while bus is loading or unloading passengers.
Title
Highway Safety
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Hood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-01-11 | House | Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2012-12-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0158 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Transportation
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/75 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0075/BillText/Filed/PDF |