FL H0075 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1101
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1101
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that minor commits offense of sexting if he or she knowingly uses computer, or any other device capable of electronic data transmission or distribution, to transmit or distribute to another minor any photograph or video of any person which depicts nudity & is harmful to minors; provides noncriminal & criminal penalties; provides that transmission, distribution, or possession of multiple photographs or videos is single offense if transmission occurs within 24-hour period, etc.
Title
Offense of Sexting
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Abruzzo [D] | Sen. Lori Berman [D] | House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
Rep. Richard Glorioso [R] | House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Hazelle Rogers [D] | Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#385 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#385 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1101 | |
2011-05-03 | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Budget -SJ 732 | |
2011-04-29 | In Messages | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time -HJ 909 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/11 | |
2011-04-11 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 610 | |
2011-04-08 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-07 | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 601 | |
2011-04-05 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/07/11, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-28 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/30/11, 8:00 am, 404 HOB --Temporarily deferred | |
2011-03-24 | Original reference(s) removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | |
2011-03-23 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-22 | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 281 | |
2011-03-18 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/22/11, 8:30 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 12 | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 12 | |
2010-12-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0888 () 2011-05-03 - Read 2nd time -SJ 732