FL H0065 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes patient eligibility criteria & requirements relating to access to & use of investigational stem cell treatments; requires DOH to adopt rules; prohibits governmental interference in such treatments; requires institutional review boards to oversee treatments, keep records, & submit reports; prohibits purchase or sale of stem cells; provides penalties.
Title
Stem Cells
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Clemons [R] | Rep. Cary Pigman [R] | Rep. James Bush [D] | Rep. Joseph Casello [D] |
Rep. Bobby Payne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-11-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S954 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
385 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
873 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/65 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/65/BillText/Filed/PDF |