FL H0059 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-194
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-194
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates act as "Florida Unborn Victims of Violence Act"; provides rule of construction that person who engages in conduct that violates Florida Criminal Code or criminal offense defined by another statute & causes death of, or bodily injury to unborn child commits separate offense if such offense is not specifically provided for; provides for penalties; specifies that certain types of knowledge or intent are not necessary for such offense; provides exceptions; revises definitions & terminology.
Title
Offenses Against Unborn Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#574 (Y: 74 N: 42 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#574 (Y: 74 N: 42 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Chapter No. 2014-194 | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-24 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-23 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 25 NAYS 14 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Substituted for SB 162 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2014-04-11 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-11 | House | Immediately certified |
2014-04-11 | House | CS passed; YEAS 74 NAYS 42 |
2014-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-07 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/09/14 |
2014-03-04 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-03 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 3 |
2014-02-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/03/14, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2014-02-14 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | CS referred to Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2014-02-13 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-02-12 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 4 |
2014-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/12/14, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2013-10-07 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2013-09-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0162 (Similar To) 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 59 (Ch. 2014-194)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |