FL H0031 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Chapter No. 2022-110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Chapter No. 2022-110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides firefighters have certain rights during informal inquiry; provides firefighter may not be subjected to certain disciplinary action during informal inquiry or interrogation.
Title
Firefighter Inquiries and Investigations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#33 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#513 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-01 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#513 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-01 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Chapter No. 2022-110 | |
2022-05-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-05-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-02-17 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-02-17 | House | In Messages |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Substituted for SB 264 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-02-10 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-02-10 | House | Immediately certified |
2022-02-10 | House | Passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2022-02-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-09 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-02-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-03 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/9/2022) |
2022-01-13 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-01-13 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-01-13 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-13 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2021-12-01 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2021-12-01 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-12-01 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-11-23 | House | Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda |
2021-10-20 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-10-20 | House | Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-10-20 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-10-13 | House | Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-09-17 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-09-17 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-09-17 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-09-17 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-08-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S264 (Same As) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 31
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |