FL S0264 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that firefighters have certain rights during an informal inquiry; providing that a firefighter may not be threatened with certain disciplinary action during an informal inquiry or interrogation, etc.
Title
Firefighter Inquiries and Investigations
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Hooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 31 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Substituted HB 31 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/22 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/03/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/12/22, 9:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H31 (Same As) 2022-05-12 - Chapter No. 2022-110
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |