FL H0029 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to provider hospitals; requires hospital to notify obstetrical physicians before closing its obstetrical department or ceasing to provide obstetrical services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Responsibilities of Health Care Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#424 (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19SenateDied in Health Policy
2015-06-12SenateReceived
2015-06-12SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations
2015-06-12SenateIn Messages
2015-06-12HousePassed; YEAS 97 NAYS 3
2015-06-12HouseRead 3rd time
2015-06-11HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-06-11HouseRead 2nd time
2015-06-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/11/15
2015-06-10HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-06-10HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2015-06-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 06/10/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2015-06-01HouseReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2015-06-01HouseIntroduced
2015-05-27HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
383336Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951051Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback