FL H0027 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes amendment to s. 4, Art. VII of State Constitution to revise requirements for annual change in assessments of homestead property to prohibit increase in assessed value of homestead property if just value of that property decreases, to take effect January 1, 2011.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homestead Property/Declining Just Value

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Finance & Tax Council
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Finance & Tax Council; Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00011
2009-10-01 Referred to Finance & Tax Council; Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2009-07-13 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0039 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
S0718 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
S2650 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
01231New CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback