FL S2650 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes amendments to the State Constitution to prohibit increases in the assessed value of homestead property if the market value of the property decreases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homestead Property Assessed Value [WPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Community Affairs
2010-03-11 Introduced -SJ 00225
2010-03-09 Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00225
2010-02-26 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0027 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
H0039 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
S0718 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00704Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback