FL H0021 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-136
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revising the Agency for Health Care Administration's rulemaking authority with respect to minimum standards for hospitals; requiring hospitals that provide certain services to meet specified licensure requirements; revising duties and responsibilities of the agency relating to issuance of licenses to health care facilities and health service providers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospital Licensure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#286 (Y: 81 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 77 N: 33 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26 Chapter No. 2019-136
2019-06-25 Approved by Governor
2019-06-25 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-29HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-04-29HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 81 NAYS 34
2019-04-29HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (485034) 991
2019-04-29HouseIn returning messages
2019-04-29SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 23 NAYS 17
2019-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-26SenateAmendment(s) adopted (485034)
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-26SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1712
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-26SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-04-02SenateReceived
2019-03-28SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-03-27SenateIn Messages
2019-03-21HouseCS passed; YEAS 77 NAYS 33
2019-03-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-20HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-03-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/20/19
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-14HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 3
2019-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/14/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-08HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-08HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-08HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-07HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-07HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-07HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 9:00 am, Mashburn Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1712 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 21 (Ch. 2019-136)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
154245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
154246Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15927Amended CodeSee Bill Text
186503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
18908Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2201845Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37630781Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37686Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3814066Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383216Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3950191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3956025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4006085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4080361Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408037Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408038Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408039Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408044Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4080455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40807Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408808Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408810Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408820Amended CodeSee Bill Text
651118Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/21
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/21/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/21/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/21/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/21/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/21/Amendment/307437/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/21/Amendment/594457/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/21/Amendment/485034/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/21/Vote/HouseVote_h00021c1013.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/21/Vote/SenateVote_h00021c1006.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/21/Vote/HouseVote_h00021c1286.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback