FL S1712 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 21 (Ch. 2019-136)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the Agency for Health Care Administration's rulemaking authority with respect to minimum standards for hospitals; authorizing the agency to issue a license to a general hospital that has not been issued a certificate of need under certain circumstances; providing an exception from certificate of need review requirements for the construction or establishment of a general hospital and the conversion of a specialty hospital to a general hospital, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospital Licensure

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 21 (Ch. 2019-136)
2019-04-26SenateSubstituted CS/HB 21
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-22SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2019-04-19SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-18SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 13 NAYS 7
2019-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-11SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/09/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-03SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2019-04-03SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-04-02SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-01SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2019-03-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/01/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/18/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Amendment(s) Adopted - Temporarily Postponed
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H21 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-136

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
395003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3950191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3956025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4080361Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408037Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408039Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408808Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1712
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1712/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1712/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1712/BillText/c2/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1712/Amendment/820832/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1712/Amendment/780192/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1712/Amendment/520418/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1712/Amendment/455382/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1712/Amendment/818512/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1712/Amendment/590662/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1712/Amendment/349374/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1712/Amendment/941874/HTML

Bill Comments

feedback