FL H0021 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]


Requiring certain boards to require certain registered practitioners to complete a specified board-approved continuing education course to obtain authorization to prescribe controlled substances as part of biennial license renewal and before a specified date; requiring the applicable boards to adopt rules establishing certain guidelines for prescribing controlled substances for acute pain; providing requirements for pharmacists for the dispensing of controlled substances to persons not known to them; authorizing a pharmacist to dispense controlled substances upon receipt of an electronic prescription if certain conditions are met, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Controlled Substances


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#62 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#899 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#696 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-03-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2018-03-09SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-09SenateConcurred in House amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) (165513, 829389, 985559) 1052
2018-03-09SenateIn returning messages
2018-03-09HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 99 NAYS 0 1180
2018-03-09HouseConcurred in Senate amendment(s) as amended
2018-03-09HouseAmendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted (165513, 829389, 985559)
2018-03-08HouseIn returning messages
2018-03-08SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-08SenateAmendment(s) reconsidered, adopted as amended (872398) 925
2018-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-07SenateAmendment(s) adopted (397172) 873
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 8
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-07SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules
2018-03-01SenateIn Messages
2018-03-01HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2018-03-01HouseRead 3rd time 748
2018-02-28HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-28HouseAmendment(s) adopted (091281, 771849)
2018-02-28HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-22HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time 663
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-22HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-21HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-02-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/21/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-22HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-22HouseFavorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-01-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 01/22/18, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall
2018-01-16HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2018-01-11HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-11HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-11HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2018-01-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 4:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
2017-10-26HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S458 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
S8 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 21
H1159 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4560301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45644Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4630055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4650155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4650276Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8930551Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/21/Vote/HouseVote_h00021e1696.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/21/Vote/SenateVote_h00021e1015.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/21/Vote/HouseVote_h00021e1899.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/21/Vote/SenateVote_h00021e1062.PDF

Bill Comments