FL H0011 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that the House of Representatives and the Senate convene in Joint Session for the purpose of receiving a message from the Governor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Session for Purpose of Receiving Governor's Message

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseLaid on Table
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-02-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1018 (Same As) 2019-03-06 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback