FL H0003 | 2022 | 4th Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 4-D (Ch. 2022-269)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 4-D (Ch. 2022-269)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing roofing system or roof section of certain existing buildings or structures does not have to be repaired, replaced, or recovered in accordance with the Florida Building Code under certain circumstances; requiring the Florida Building Commission to adopt rules and incorporate the rules into the building code; prohibiting local governments from adopting certain administrative or technical amendments to the building code.
Title
Roof Repair, Replacement, and Recovering Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 4-D (Ch. 2022-269) |
2022-05-24 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-05-24 | House | Bill released to Rules Committee |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-24 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-23 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2022-05-23 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S4 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Chapter No. 2022-269
H19 (Similar To) 2022-05-27 - Died in Appropriations Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 4-D (Ch. 2022-269)
H19 (Similar To) 2022-05-27 - Died in Appropriations Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 4-D (Ch. 2022-269)