FL H0003 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Preempts licensing of occupations to state; provides exceptions; prohibits local governments from imposing additional licensing requirements or modifying licensing; specifies that certain local licensing that does not meet specified criteria does not apply & may not be enforced; specifies that certain specialty contractors are not required to register with Construction Industry Licensing Board; prohibits local governments from requiring certain specialty contractors to obtain license; specifies job scopes for which local government may not require license; authorizes counties & municipalities to issue certain journeyman licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preemption of Local Occupational Licensing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#96 (Y: 88 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Community Affairs
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 88 NAYS 24
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseAmendment(s) failed (366869)
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-25HouseCS/CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2019-03-22HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-21HouseCS/CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 5
2019-03-19HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 03/21/19, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-18HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2019-03-15HouseCS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2019-03-15HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-14HouseCS/CS by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 7
2019-03-12HousePCS on Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/14/19, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-05HouseCS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-27HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-02-27HouseCS referred to State Affairs Committee; Commerce Committee
2019-02-27HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2019-02-22HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-02-21HouseCS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 5
2019-02-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 02/21/19, 10:30 am, Webster Hall
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-02-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1748 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489117Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4891455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4895335Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback