FL S1748 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting certain local governments from imposing or adopting certain regulations on businesses and business entities on or after a specified date; specifying that certain regulations expire and may only be readopted or continue to be imposed after meeting specified criteria; specifying that specified specialty contractors are not required to register with the Construction Industry Licensing Board, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preemption of Local Regulations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Community Affairs
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H3 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489117Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback