FL H0001 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-7-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-7-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to State Constitution to authorize Legislature, for all levies other than school district levies, to grant additional homestead property tax exemption on $50,000 of assessed value of homestead property owned by classroom teachers, law enforcement officers, correctional officers, firefighters, emergency medical technicians, paramedics, child welfare services professionals, active duty members of United States Armed Forces, & Florida National Guard members.
Title
Additional Homestead Property Tax Exemption for Specified Critical Public Service Workforce
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#582 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#582 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State | |
2022-03-10 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-10 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-10 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 1 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/22 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 4 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-02-24 | House | Immediately certified |
2022-02-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2022-02-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-22 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022) |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-17 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | PCS added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2022-02-07 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2022-02-02 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-02 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-01 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-01 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-01 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1563 (Related) 2022-03-10 - Ordered enrolled
S1746 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1748 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1746 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1748 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations