FL H0001 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to State Constitution to limit to 12 consecutive years, the number of years supreme court justices & district court judges may hold the same office & prohibiting justices or district court judges from being reappointed for 1 year after leaving office. Justices and district court judges in office on January 9, 2019 & future appointees are subject to term limit.
Title
Judicial Term Limits
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Sullivan [R] | Sen. Ben Albritton [R] | Rep. Dane Eagle [R] | Rep. Jason Fischer [R] |
Rep. Larry Metz [R] | Sen. Ray Rodrigues [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#35 (Y: 73 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Rules |
2017-03-30 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-03-29 | House | Passed; YEAS 73 NAYS 46 |
2017-03-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-29 | House | Amendment(s) failed (115709, 203245, 240027, 368361, 439969, 501941, 728183, 760147, 872591, 924205) |
2017-03-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/29/17 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 8 |
2017-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/21/17, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-02-09 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 7 |
2017-02-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 02/09/17, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0482 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 5085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
414 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |