FL H0001 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Designates act "Jeffrey Klee Memorial Act"; eliminates statute of limitations for wrongful death actions for intentional torts resulting in death from acts described in specified provisions relating to murder & manslaughter; provides for application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statutes of Limitations [SPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0032 - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0582 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-45
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-23 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01032
2010-04-22 Read 3rd time -SJ 00731; Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 -SJ 00731
2010-04-21 Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00687; Substituted for SB 92 -SJ 00687; Read 2nd time -SJ 00687
2010-04-20 Received -SJ 00656
2010-04-19 Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00656
2010-03-23 In Messages
2010-03-18 Read 3rd time -HJ 00319; Passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 00319
2010-03-16 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00286
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00010; On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), 11/03/09, 8:45 am, Reed Hall; Favorable by Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00164; Now in Policy Council -HJ 00164; On Council agenda-- Policy Council, 01/21/10, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall; Favorable by Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00166; Now in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00166; On Council agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council, 02/02/10, 10:00 am, 404-H; Favorable by- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00167; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00167
2010-02-02 Favorable by- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0; Placed on Calendar
2010-01-26 On Council agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council, 02/02/10, 10:00 am, 404-H
2010-01-21 Favorable by Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0; Now in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
2010-01-14 On Council agenda-- Policy Council, 01/21/10, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2009-11-03 Favorable by Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); YEAS 12 NAYS 0; Now in Policy Council
2009-10-27 On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP), 11/03/09, 8:45 am, Reed Hall
2009-10-01 Referred to Civil Justice & Courts Policy (CCJP); Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
2009-05-28 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0092 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00687; Substituted HB 1 -SJ 00687; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1 (Ch. 2010-45) -SJ 00687

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
009511Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback