DE SJR4 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
While Delaware is deeply committed to preparing every child to reach his or her full potential and succeed in the new economy, the State will not be able to build a world-class education system for its children without modernizing the 70-year-old education funding system. This Joint Resolution establishes the Education Funding Improvement Commission to conduct a comprehensive review of Delaware’s public education funding system and make recommendations to modernize and strengthen the system. The Commission will include stakeholders from across the education system and will submit a report and recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly no later than March 31, 2016. Author: Senator Sokola
Title
Establishing The Education Funding Improvement Commission To Review And Make Recommendations To Modernize And Improve Delaware's System For Funding Public Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-07-01 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2015-06-25 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |