DE SJR2 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Joint Resolution urges the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission to accept either alternative cost allocation methodology of the Artificial Island Project as presented by PJM.
Title
Urging The Federal Energy Regulatory Commission To Accept Either Of Pjm Interconnection, L.l.c.s Alternative Methodologies For Allocating The Cost Of The Artificial Island Project As Recommended By Governor Carney And Governor Hogan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-06-28 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Energy) in House with 5 Favorable, 1 Unfavorable | |
2017-06-23 | Assigned to Energy Committee in House | |
2017-06-22 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2017-06-22 | Rules Supension in Senate | |
2017-06-22 | Introduced in Senate |