DE SB95 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The Regulatory Flexibility and Transparency Act of 2015 improves Delaware’s regulatory environment for individuals and small businesses in several significant ways. Under the Act, whenever an agency proposes to adopt or amend a regulation that is “substantially likely” to impose additional costs or burdens upon individuals and/or small businesses, that agency must prepare both a written regulatory flexibility analysis and a regulatory impact statement to be published by the Registrar of Regulations. The regulatory flexibility analysis requires agencies to consider specific methods of reducing the burdens of a proposed regulation on individuals and small businesses. The regulatory impact statement improves transparency by, among other things, requiring agencies to describe the purpose of the proposed regulation; to identify the individuals and small businesses subject to it; and to provide an estimate of the potential costs of complying with the proposed regulation. Exceptions to the above requirements include, among others, emergency regulations, regulations that are exempt from the APA’s procedural requirements, and certain regulations relating to licensed professions. The Act further improves transparency by requiring the Registrar to transmit the above information to the appropriate standing committee of the General Assembly. In addition, it expands the definition of “small business” to include any enterprise that employs fewer than 50 people and has gross receipts of less than $10 million. To help agencies meet their obligations under the Act, the Registrar, OMB, and the Department of State are required to submit guidelines for final publication by the Registrar no later than November 15, 2015. If enacted, the Act would become effective for all new or amended regulations submitted to the Registrar on or after January 1, 2016.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Regulatory Flexibility And Transparency Act Of 2015.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | Stricken |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Assigned to Labor & Industrial Relations Committee in Senate |