DE SB93 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This Act provides protections for consumers in connection with contracts with automatic renewal provisions. Multiple states have enacted laws regulating the automatic renewals of contracts, often described as "evergreen" clauses. These state laws are aimed at protecting consumers from unknowingly entering into these types of agreements by requiring that evergreen clauses be presented in a clear and conspicuous manner and that sellers of such contracts provide notice to consumers about an upcoming renewal.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Related To Consumer Contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-04 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-10 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2021-06-09 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-09 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 93 |